Download: Click Here
Password: ojasgkjob123
Download: Click Here
Sir Osborne Smith 01-04-1935 to 30-06-1937
Sir Osborne Smith was
the first Governor of the Reserve Bank. A professional banker, he served for
over 20 years with the Bank of New South Wales and 10 years with the
Commonwealth Bank of Australia before coming to India in 1926 as a Managing
Governor of the Imperial Bank of India.
Sir
James Braid Taylor 01-07-1937 to 17-02-1943
Sir Benegal Rama Rau 01-07-1949 to 14-01-1957
K G Ambegaonkar 14-01-1957 to 28-02-1957
H V R Iengar 01-03-1957 to 28-02-1962
P C Bhattacharya 01-03-1962 to
30-06-1967
L K
Jha 01-07-1967 to 03-05-1970
B N Adarkar 04-05-1970 to 15-06-1970
S Jagannathan 16-06-1970 to 19-05-1975
N C Sen Gupta 19-05-1975 to 19-08-1975
K R Puri 20-08-1975 to 02-05-1977
M Narasimham 02-05-1977 to 30-11-1977
Dr. I G Patel 01-12-1977 to 15-09-1982
Dr. Manmohan Singh 16-09-1982 to 14-01-1985
A
Ghosh 15-01-1985 to 04-02-1985
R N
Malhotra 04-02-1985 to 22-12-1990
Venkitaramanan 22-12-1990 to 21-12-1992
Dr.
C Rangarajan 22-12-1992 to 21-11-1997
Dr. Bimal Jalan 22-11-1997 to 06-09-2003
Dr. Y V Reddy 06-09-2003 to 05-09-2008
Dr. D. Subbarao 05-09-2008 to 04-09-13
Dr. Raghuram Rajan 04-09-2013 to 04-09-2016
Dr. Urjit R. Patel 04-09-2016 to 11-12-2018
Shri Shaktikanta Das 12-12-2018 to date
Password: ojasgkjob123